EP2482148 - Method for projecting and/or programming a multi-functional component of an industrial automation assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ketzer, Martin Friedrich-Bauerstrasse 25 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Kob, Peter Oedenberger Weg 4 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | 03 /
Kohl, Thomas Siedlungsstrasse 19 91580 Petersaurach / DE | 04 /
Lange, Ronald Virchowstrasse 28 90766 Fürth / DE | 05 /
Narr, oliver Gibitzenhofstrasse 75 90443 Nürnberg / DE | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/31] | Application number, filing date | 11152195.1 | 26.01.2011 | [2012/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2482148 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2482148 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05B19/05 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
G05B19/056 (EP);
G05B19/0426 (EP);
G05B2219/15101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2012/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Projektierung und/oder Programmierung einer multifunktionalen Komponente einer industriellen Automatisierungsanordnung | [2012/31] | English: | Method for projecting and/or programming a multi-functional component of an industrial automation assembly | [2012/31] | French: | Procédé de projection et/ou de programmation d'un composant multifonctionnel d'un agencement d'automatisation industriel | [2012/31] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2011 | AL | 13.06.2018 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | DK | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | ES | 13.06.2018 | FI | 13.06.2018 | HR | 13.06.2018 | LT | 13.06.2018 | LV | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | MK | 13.06.2018 | MT | 13.06.2018 | NL | 13.06.2018 | PL | 13.06.2018 | RO | 13.06.2018 | RS | 13.06.2018 | SE | 13.06.2018 | SI | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | SM | 13.06.2018 | TR | 13.06.2018 | BG | 13.09.2018 | NO | 13.09.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | PT | 15.10.2018 | AT | 26.01.2019 | GB | 26.01.2019 | IE | 26.01.2019 | LU | 26.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.01.2011 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
MT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
AT | 26.01.2019 | ||
GB | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
MT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
AT | 26.01.2019 | ||
GB | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
AT | 26.01.2019 | ||
GB | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1233317 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]WO2005033810 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1* page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 23 *; | [A] - SIEMENS AG, "Application for Human Machine Interface, Applications & Tools: PC-based Automation with SIMATIC WinAC, Configuration and Operation of WinCC and Tuning of WinAC RTX", 20040728, no. V 1.0, (20040728), pages 1 - 44, URL: http://support.automation.siemens.com, (20110302), XP002625887 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |