EP2481945 - Suspension device for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEMSCHEIDT FAHRWERKTECHNIK GmbH & Co. KG Leichtmetallstrasse 7 42781 Haan-Gruiten / DE | [2012/52] |
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states HEMSCHEIDT FAHRWERKTECHNIK GmbH & Co. KG Leichtmetallstrasse 5 42781 Haan-Gruiten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Runkel, Walter Kreuzstrasse 15 53547, Leubsdorf / DE | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Schlossbleiche 20 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Schloßbleiche 20 42103 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 11152393.2 | 27.01.2011 | [2012/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2481945 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2481945 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/06 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
F16F9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Title | German: | Federungseinrichtung für Fahrzeuge | [2012/31] | English: | Suspension device for vehicles | [2012/31] | French: | Dispositif d'amortissement pour véhicules | [2012/31] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 10.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2011 | AL | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | HR | 26.12.2012 | IT | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MK | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | NL | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | RS | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | SM | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | IE | 27.01.2013 | LU | 27.01.2013 | BE | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | BG | 26.03.2013 | NO | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | ES | 06.04.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AL | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 27.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AL | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 27.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AL | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 27.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AL | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 27.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 27.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/32] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RS | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
NO | 26.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4257581 (KEELER II MINER S) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5465811 (KATZ WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2006027954 (NESBITT THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US7140601 (NESBITT THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]EP1745951 (HEMSCHEIDT FAHRWERKTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1745951 | EP20090168192 |