EP2378259 - Multi-spectral pyrometry imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Estevadeordal, Jordi Global Research, Patent Docket Room Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Nirmalan, Nirm Velumylum Global Research, Patent Docket Room, Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
Wang, Guanghua Global Research, Patent Docket Room, Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 04 /
Sakami, Mohamed GE Global Research, Patent Docket Room K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2011/42] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11152437.7 | 27.01.2011 | [2011/42] | Priority number, date | US20100750425 | 30.03.2010 Original published format: US 750425 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2378259 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/60, G01J5/00, G01J5/08 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
G01J5/602 (EP,US);
G01J5/00 (EP,US);
G01J5/0014 (EP,US);
G01J5/0088 (EP,US);
G01J5/08 (EP,US);
G01J5/0802 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Multispektrales Pyrometrieabbildungssystem | [2011/42] | English: | Multi-spectral pyrometry imaging system | [2011/42] | French: | Système d'imagerie de pyrométrie multi-spectrale | [2011/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4075493 (WICKERSHEIM KENNETH A) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 3 * * column 9, lines 3-10 * * column 10, lines 34-40 ** column 11, lines 35-36 *; | [XI]US4780832 (SHAH NIPULKUMAR G [GB]) [X] 1,3,5-7,9,11,12,14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-8 * * column 3, lines 38-47 * * column 4, lines 21-59 * * column 5, lines 12-28 * [I] 2,4,8,10,13,15 |