12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
17.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
09.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
07.11.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
10.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
22.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
29.11.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] |
08.11.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.10.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.10.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.06.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.06.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2012 |
First examination report |
|
24.02.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
10.02.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.09.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
08.07.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |