EP2484459 - Clamping method and device for carrying out the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gasparini, Luciano Via Fratelli Bandiera, 12 31036 Istrana (TV) / IT | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Feltrinelli, Secondo Andrea, et al APTA S.r.l. Patent Department Via Ca' di Cozzi, 41 37124 Verona / IT | [2012/32] | Application number, filing date | 11153119.0 | 02.02.2011 | [2012/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2484459 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/02, B21D43/00, B21D43/10, B21D43/11, B25J15/02 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
B21D43/003 (EP);
B21D43/105 (EP);
B21D43/11 (EP);
B21D5/0281 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spannverfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Ausführung | [2012/32] | English: | Clamping method and device for carrying out the same | [2012/32] | French: | Procédé de préhension et dispositif permettant de l'effectuer | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 12.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 12.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0443295 (SULZER AG [CH]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 10; figure - *; | [X]EP0438030 (SULZER AG [CH]) [X] 1-15 * figure - *; | [X]DE10157783 (KURTZ ALTAUSSEE GMBH ALTAUSSEE [AT]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]DE3823621 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB784981 | EP0476092 |