EP2312599 - Illuminated key-pad assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [2012/12] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Chao Carl 508 Mountbatten Avenue Waterloo Ontario N2T 2T8 / CA | 02 /
Kyowski, Timothy Herbert 19 Childerhouse Crescent Brantford Ontario N3P 1Z8 / CA | 03 /
Penner, Dennis James 39 David Street Wellesley Ontario N0B 2T0 / CA | [2012/12] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
Chen, Chao Carl 508 Mountbatten Avenue Waterloo Ontario N2T 2T8 / CA | ||
02 /
Kyowski, Timothy Herbert 19 Childerhouse Crescent Brantford Ontario N3P 1Z8 / CA | |||
03 /
Penner, Dennis James 39 David Street Wellesley Ontario N0B 2T0 / CA | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2011/16] | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al Ipulse 9-10 Savile Row GB-London W1S 3PF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11153235.4 | 29.10.2007 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2312599 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2312599 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2312599 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70, H04M1/22 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
H01H13/704 (EP);
H04M1/22 (EP);
H01H2209/074 (EP);
H01H2219/03 (EP);
H01H2219/036 (EP);
H01H2219/062 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | Beleuchtete Tastaturbaugruppe | [2011/16] | English: | Illuminated key-pad assembly | [2011/16] | French: | Ensemble clavier illuminé | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 28.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07119553.1 / EP2056317 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070119553) is 06.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2007 | AT | 21.03.2012 | BE | 21.03.2012 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | IT | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | MT | 21.03.2012 | PL | 21.03.2012 | RO | 21.03.2012 | SE | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | ES | 02.07.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | IE | 29.10.2012 | LU | 29.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
LU | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 21.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006181506 (FYKE STEVEN H [CA]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0059]; figures 4,7 *; | [A]EP1724800 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0039]; figures 2-7 *; | [A]EP1737010 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0068]; figure 3 * | by applicant | US6575586 |