EP2364013 - Information processing apparatus, method and program for imaging device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasahara, Shunichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Takaoka, Ryo c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
Matsutani, Atsushi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
Yana, Kanako c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2014/36] |
Former [2011/36] | Lewis, Darren John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11153331.1 | 04.02.2011 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | JP20100048098 | 04.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010048098 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2364013 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2364013 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2364013 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/232, H04N5/235 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
H04N23/56 (EP,US);
G06T7/00 (KR);
H04N23/611 (US);
G03B17/54 (US);
G03B21/00 (KR);
G06F3/017 (US);
G06T1/00 (KR);
G06V40/28 (US);
H04N23/61 (EP,US);
H04N23/62 (EP,US);
H04N23/632 (EP,US);
H04N23/74 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung, -verfahren und -programm für Bildaufnahmevorrichtung | [2011/36] | English: | Information processing apparatus, method and program for imaging device | [2011/36] | French: | Appareil, procédé et programme de traitement d'informations pour dispositif de prise de vue | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 18.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.04.2021 | 22.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.06.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21214242.6 / EP3996361 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2011 | AL | 15.12.2021 | AT | 15.12.2021 | CY | 15.12.2021 | CZ | 15.12.2021 | DK | 15.12.2021 | EE | 15.12.2021 | ES | 15.12.2021 | FI | 15.12.2021 | HR | 15.12.2021 | IT | 15.12.2021 | LT | 15.12.2021 | LV | 15.12.2021 | MC | 15.12.2021 | MK | 15.12.2021 | NL | 15.12.2021 | PL | 15.12.2021 | RO | 15.12.2021 | RS | 15.12.2021 | SE | 15.12.2021 | SI | 15.12.2021 | SK | 15.12.2021 | SM | 15.12.2021 | TR | 15.12.2021 | IE | 04.02.2022 | LU | 04.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | BG | 15.03.2022 | NO | 15.03.2022 | GR | 16.03.2022 | IS | 15.04.2022 | PT | 18.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
MK | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 15.12.2021 | |
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 15.12.2021 | |
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 15.12.2021 | |
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 15.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6806906 (SOGA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]US7317485 (MIYAKE IZUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [X]JP2008129120 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1,4,10,11 * abstract *; | [AD]JP2008152622 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [AD] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [X]WO2008120217 (PRIME SENSE LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract; page 2, line 31 to page 3, line 3; page 6, lines 2 to 18; page 7, lines 8-16 *; | [A]JP2008276128 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [AD]JP2009070245 (RICOH KK) [AD] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [AD]JP2009076983 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [AD] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]US2009102940 (UCHIDA AKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,10,11 * paragraphs 93-102, 106-122 *; | [X]US2009183125 (MAGAL OZ [IL], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract; paragraphs 7, 8, 21, 30, 35, 36, 51-53 *; | [A]US2009295712 (RITZAU JAN ROBERT TOBIAS [SE]) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract; paragraph 38 *; | [XP]WO2010088032 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [XP] 1-11* abstract; paragraphs 24, 35, 38 * | Examination | WO0021024 | US2008143975 | - M Rauterberg ET AL, "BUILD-IT: a computer vision-based interaction technique for a planning tool. In H BUILD-IT: a computer vision-based interaction technique for a planning tool", People and Computers XII: Proceedings of HCI'97, (19970101), pages 303 - 314, URL: http://www.fjeld.ch/pub/media/1997-Rauterberg_et_al-BUILD-IT_A_Computer_Vision-Based_Interaction _Technique_for_a_Planning_Tool.pdf, (20140724), XP055131593 | by applicant | JP2006523067 | JP2008152622 | JP2009070245 | JP2009076983 | JP2010048098 |