EP2322717 - Surface treatment machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR PAVING PRODUCTS INC. 9401 85th Avenue North Brooklyn Park Minnesota 55445 / US | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sansone, Dario Via R. Bacchelli, 21 Località Mascarino Venezzano 40050, Castello D'Argile Bo / IT | 02 /
Di Tosto, Antonio Via Curiel, 21 40016, San Giorgio di Piano Bo / IT | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11153412.9 | 22.12.2006 | [2011/20] | Previously filed application, date | EP20060127039 | 22.12.2006 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2322717 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2322717 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E01C23/088 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
E01C23/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | Oberflächenbehandlungsmaschine | [2011/20] | English: | Surface treatment machine | [2011/20] | French: | Machine de traitement de surface | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 29.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06127039.3 / EP1936033 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060127039) is 05.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4325580 (SWISHER JR GEORGE W, et al) [A] 1,15 * column 2, lines 39-58 * * column 15, line 17 - column 17, line 53; figure 9 * * column 19, line 39 - column 20, line 17 *; | [XDAI]US2004021364 (BUSLEY PETER [DE], et al) [XD] 1-3,8,10-17,23 * paragraphs [0008] , [0018] , [0032] - [0045] - [0048]; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 9,22 [I] 4-7,18-21; | [A]WO2005005119 (WIRTGEN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,15* page 4, lines 21-30 *; | [A]DE102005028091 (ABG ALLG BAUMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0007] * |