EP2360454 - System for enhancing a vehicle operator's orientation and ability to navigate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feyereisen, Thea L. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O.Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Nichols, Troy HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O.Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
Suddreth, John G. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O.Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11153462.4 | 04.02.2011 | [2011/34] | Priority number, date | US20100704918 | 12.02.2010 Original published format: US 704918 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2360454 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01C23/00 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
G01C23/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur Verbesserung der Orientierung eines Fahrzeugführers und dessen Navigationsfähigkeit | [2011/34] | English: | System for enhancing a vehicle operator's orientation and ability to navigate | [2011/34] | French: | Système pour améliorer l'orientation d'un opérateur de véhicule et sa capacité à naviguer | [2011/34] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 28.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/24] | 05.05.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.09.2015 | 30.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003023354 (BRUST CLIFFORD S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0012] * [I] 3,6,9; | [I]US2007182590 (YOUNKIN JAMES R [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028]; figure 1A * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0057] *; | [A]US6111525 (BERLIOZ RAYMOND JACQUES GERARD [FR], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 28; figure 2 * |