EP2362521 - Power generation frequency control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Grid Solutions LLC 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA 30339-8402 / US | [2024/04] |
Former [2023/32] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states General Electric Company a New York Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'Brien, Kathleen Ann GE Global Research 1 Research Circle Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Delmerico, Robert William GE Global Research 1 Research Circle Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
Schelenz, Owen Jannis GE Global Research 1 Research Circle Building K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2023/32] |
Former [2011/35] | Bedford, Grant Richard Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11153468.1 | 07.02.2011 | [2011/35] | Priority number, date | US20100713717 | 26.02.2010 Original published format: US 713717 | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2362521 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2362521 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2362521 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, H02J3/24, // H02J3/32 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H02J3/32 (EP,US);
H02J3/241 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J2300/26 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/35] | H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] |
Former [2011/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Frequenzsteuerung für eine Energieerzeugung | [2011/35] | English: | Power generation frequency control | [2011/35] | French: | Contrôle de fréquence de génération électrique | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.06.2022 | 07.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2020 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 11.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.10.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SI | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1555746 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,8,10* the whole document *; | [Y]US2005281064 (OLSEN IB I [US], et al) [Y] 4,9 * abstract * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0026] *; | [I]EP1780860 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [I] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * figures 1-5 *; | [IY]US2008212343 (LASSETER ROBERT H [US], et al) [I] 1-3,5-8,10 * abstract * * figures 4,5,10,11,12 * * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0011] , [0038] , [0039] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * [Y] 4,9 | Examination | - Senjyu Tomonobu ET AL, "A Control Method for Small Utility Connected Large PV System to Reduce Frequency Deviation Using a Minimal-Order Observer", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ENERGY CONVERSION., US, (20090601), vol. 24, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TEC.2008.2001436, ISSN 0885-8969, pages 520 - 528, XP055925375 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TEC.2008.2001436 | by applicant | US20090565004 |