EP2485458 - Operating a track-bound vehicle, in particular rail vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Schöneberger Ufer 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Schöneberger Ufer 1 10785 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauspie, Patrick Bergenstraat 7 8972, Roesbrugge / BE | 02 /
Hilde, Laurent Rue de la Poterne 59130, Orchies / FR | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Brunotte, Joachim Wilhelm Eberhard Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Brunotte, Joachim Wilhelm Eberhard Bressel und Partner Patentanwälte Park Kolonnaden Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11153512.6 | 07.02.2011 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2485458 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Betrieb eines spurabhängigen Fahrzeugs, insbesondere eines Schienenfahrzeugs | [2012/32] | English: | Operating a track-bound vehicle, in particular rail vehicle | [2012/32] | French: | Opération d'un véhicule relié à des rails, en particulier d'un véhicule ferroviaire | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003045974 (MARUYAMA KIYOYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0076] *; | [A]US2008262909 (LI LI [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0028] * | by applicant | EP1717992 | US5485347 |