EP2365728 - Temperature control system and temperature control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2013/14] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egi, Mamoru c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Elsenheimerstrasse 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11153528.2 | 07.02.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | JP20100054248 | 11.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010054248 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2365728 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/74 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
H05B3/746 (EP,US);
G05D23/19 (KR);
H05B2213/03 (EP,US);
H05B2213/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Temperatursteuerungssystem und Temperatursteuerungsverfahren | [2011/37] | English: | Temperature control system and temperature control method | [2011/37] | French: | Système de contrôle de la température et procédé de contrôle de la température | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 08.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 22.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10033361 (WARTMANN THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-4 ** paragraphs [0019] - [0029] *; | [A]EP1303168 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] * * figure 5 *; | [A]EP1439739 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JP2008332717 | JP2001274069 |