EP2364014 - Image pickup apparatus and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ooi, Toshiharu c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11154040.7 | 10.02.2011 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | JP20100046499 | 03.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010046499 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364014 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/235, G03B7/00 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
G03B7/097 (EP,US);
H04N23/73 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2011/36] | English: | Image pickup apparatus and control method thereof | [2011/36] | French: | Appareil de capture d'images et son procédé de commande | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/05] | 17.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2015 | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/05] | 29.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0720361 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 41 - column 3, line 56 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 14 * [I] 3,8; | [XI]US2005219395 (SUGIMOTO MASAHIKO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * [I] 3,8; | [XI]US2007081081 (CHENG BRETT A [CA]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] *[I] 4,9 | by applicant | JP2004266362 | JP2010046499 |