EP2327694 - Substituted 4-amino-picolinic acids and their use as herbicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences, LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis Indiana 46268-1054 / US | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Epp, Jeffrey 17947 Kinder Oak Drive Noblesville, IN, 46062 / US | 02 /
Schmitzer, Paul 7960 North Whittier Place Indianapolis, IN, 46250 / US | 03 /
Balko, Terry 1410 Bowman Drive Greenfield, IN, 46140 / US | 04 /
Ruiz, James 13448 Glen Oaks Court Westfield, IN, 46074 / US | 05 /
Yerkes, Carla 4571 South State Road 47 Crawfordsville, IN, 47933 / US | 06 /
Siddall, Thomas 1925 South 900 East Zionsville, IN, 46077 / US | 07 /
Lo, William 12027 Weathered Edge Drive Fishers, IN, 46037 / US | [2013/30] |
Former [2011/22] | 01 /
Epp, Jeffrey 17947 Kinder Oak Drive Noblesville, IN, 46062 / US | ||
02 /
Schmitzer, Paul 7960 North Whittier Place Indianapolis, IN, 46250 / US | |||
03 /
Balko, Terry 1410 Bowman Drive Greenfield, IN, 46140 / US | |||
04 /
Ruiz, James 13448 Glen Oaks Court Westfield, IN, 46074 / US | |||
05 /
Yerkes, Carla 4571 South State Road 47 Crawfordsville, IN, 47933 / US | |||
06 /
Siddall, Thomas 1925 South 900 East Zionsville, IN, 46077 / US | |||
07 /
Lo, William 12027 Weathered Edge Drive Fishers, IN, 46037 / US | Representative(s) | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11154175.1 | 01.10.2008 | [2011/22] | Priority number, date | US20070997210P | 02.10.2007 Original published format: US 997210 P | US20080049536P | 01.05.2008 Original published format: US 49536 P | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2327694 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2327694 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/79, C07D239/48, A01N43/40, A01N43/54 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
C07D213/79 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/54 (KR,US);
A01N43/40 (KR,US);
A01N47/18 (US);
C07D239/48 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/22] | Title | German: | Substituierte 4-Aminopicolinsäuren und deren Verwendungen als Herbizide | [2011/22] | English: | Substituted 4-amino-picolinic acids and their use as herbicides | [2011/22] | French: | Acides 4-amino-picoliniques substitués et leur utilisation en tant qu'herbicides | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 28.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08835253.9 / EP2193120 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080835253) is 28.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.07.2013 | BE | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | HR | 24.07.2013 | LT | 24.07.2013 | LV | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | MT | 24.07.2013 | NL | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | SE | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | TR | 24.07.2013 | IE | 01.10.2013 | LU | 01.10.2013 | NO | 24.10.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | IS | 24.11.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
TR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IE | 01.10.2013 | ||
LU | 01.10.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
TR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IE | 01.10.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
IE | 01.10.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 24.07.2013 | |
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 24.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]US2003114311 (BALKO TERRY WILLIAM [US], et al); | [YD]WO2007092184 (DU PONT [US], et al) | by applicant | US6297197 | US6784137 | US2004198608 | WO2005063721 | WO2007082076 | WO2007092184 | US7300907 | US7314849 |