EP2328320 - REMOTE CONTENT UPDATES FOR PORTABLE MEDIA DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/22] | Remote content updates for portable media devices | ||
[2019/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2018/31] | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | ||
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fadell, Anthony 40 Hayfields Road Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2011/22] | 01 /
Fadell, Anthony 40 Hayfields Road Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Withers & Rogers Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2012/51] | Barnfather, Karl Jon Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/22] | Gillard, Matthew Paul Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 11154733.7 | 19.12.2006 | [2011/22] | Priority number, date | US20060324863 | 03.01.2006 Original published format: US 324863 | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2328320 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2328320 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2328320 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G06F16/178 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
G06F16/40 (US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (US);
H04L67/1095 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/22] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/38] |
Former [2011/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AKTUALISIERUNG VON ENTFERNTEN INHALTEN FÜR TRAGBARE MEDIENGERÄTE | [2019/20] | English: | REMOTE CONTENT UPDATES FOR PORTABLE MEDIA DEVICES | [2019/20] | French: | MISES À JOUR DE CONTENTU À DISTANCE POUR DES DISPOSITIFS PORTATIFS DE MÉDIAS | [2019/20] |
Former [2011/22] | Aktualisierung von entfernte Inhalt für tragbare Mediengeräte | ||
Former [2011/22] | Remote content updates for portable media devices | ||
Former [2011/22] | Mises à jour de contentue à distance pour les dispositifs portatifs de médias | Examination procedure | 16.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 26.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06847856.9 / EP1977581 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060847856) is 29.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2006 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | GB | 19.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IE | 19.12.2019 | LU | 19.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | FR | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/26] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.12.2006 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GB | 19.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IE | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GB | 19.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IE | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GB | 19.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IE | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GB | 19.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IE | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IE | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002173273 (SPURGAT JEFFREY JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0096] *; | [A]US2003097379 (IRETON MARK [US]) [A] 1,16,27,28* paragraph [0031] *; | [A]WO2004084413 (SIMPLE DEVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 4,19 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0057] *; | [A]US2004267825 (NOVAK MICHAEL JOHN [US], et al) [A] 10 * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0090] *; | [X] - SINITSYN A, "A synchronization framework for personal mobile servers", PERVASIVE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS WORKSHOPS, 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND IEEE ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040314), ISBN 0-7695-2106-1, pages 208 - 212, XP010689755 [X] 1-28 * page 2, column R - page 3, column R * * page 4, column R, paragraph 3 - page 5, column L, paragraph 2 * | Examination | WO03036541 | WO2005024818 | US2005086364 | by applicant | US2005021478 |