EP2357146 - Roller sorting device and sorting method for sorting pre-forms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/33] | Roller sorting device and sorting method for sorting pre-forms as well as transport device with same | ||
[2012/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beutl, Jürgen Dorfstraße 2 93161, Reichenstetten / DE | 02 /
Seidl, Andreas Gerhardinger Str. 33 93093, Donaustauf / DE | 03 /
Seger, Martin Eugen-Roth-Str. 58 92318, Neumarkt i. d. Opf. / DE | 04 /
Michel, Jörg Unterleupoldsberg 4 95131, Schwarzenbach a. W. / DE | 05 /
Lehner, Jürgen Riedstraße 4 93087, Alteglofsheim / DE | [2013/18] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
Beutl, Jürgen Dorfstraße 2 93161, Reichenstetten / DE | ||
02 /
Seidl, Andreas Gerhardinger Str. 33 93093, Donaustauf / DE | |||
03 /
Seger, Martin Eugen-Roth-Str. 58 92318, Neumarkt i. d. Opf. / DE | |||
04 /
Michel, Jörg Unterleupoldsberg 4 95131, Schwarzenbach a. W. / DE | |||
05 /
Lehner, Jürgen Riedstraße 4 93087, Alteglofsheim / DE | Representative(s) | Bittner, Bernhard, et al Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Bittner, Bernhard, et al Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11154755.0 | 17.02.2011 | [2011/33] | Priority number, date | DE20101008367 | 17.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010008367 | [2011/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2357146 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2357146 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/14, B65G47/256, B29C49/42 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
B65G47/256 (EP,US);
B29C49/4205 (EP,US);
B65G47/1492 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/42057 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | Rollensortiereinrichtung und Sortierverfahren zum Sortieren von Vorformlingen | [2012/46] | English: | Roller sorting device and sorting method for sorting pre-forms | [2012/46] | French: | Dispositif de tri à rouleaux et procédé de tri destiné à trier des préformes | [2012/46] |
Former [2011/33] | Rollensortiereinrichtung und Sortierverfahren zum Sortieren von Vorformlingen sowie Transportvorrichtung mit solcher Rollensortiereinrichtung | ||
Former [2011/33] | Roller sorting device and sorting method for sorting pre-forms as well as transport device with same | ||
Former [2011/33] | Dispositif de tri à rouleaux et procédé de tri destiné à trier des préformes ainsi que dispositif de transport doté d'un tel dispositif de tri à rouleaux | Examination procedure | 12.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 30.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2011 | AL | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | HR | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | LV | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | MK | 01.05.2013 | MT | 01.05.2013 | NL | 01.05.2013 | PL | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | RS | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | SM | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | NO | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MK | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RS | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4202735 (CLAUS WIESEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10 * columns 1-6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0236466 (SIDEL SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,10 * pages 1-12; figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR2864050 (SIDEL SA [FR]) [A] 1,10 * pages 1-18; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]JP2005219906 (HASHIMOTO DENKI CO LTD) [X] 1 * Zusammenfassung;;; figures 1-6 * [A] 10; | [AP]EP2221261 (KRONES AG [DE]) [AP] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AP]DE102009016593 (KRONES AG [DE]) [AP] 1,10* the whole document * | by applicant | US2004109747 |