EP2364794 - Method for manufacturing a reinforced and curved metal structure and structure obtained by the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Opérations SAS 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2011/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouchet, Eric / 14, lotissement Les Genêts 31840 Aussonne / FR | 02 /
Lafly, Anne-Laure / 1, rue Bardou (B65) 31200 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
Van Der Veen, Sjoerd / 12, rue des Mésanges 31170 Tournefeuille / NL | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès 9 rue St Antoine du T 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Schwartz, Thierry J. Bloch & Bonnétat 81, boulevard Lazarre Carnot FR-31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 11154955.6 | 18.02.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | FR20100051281 | 23.02.2010 Original published format: FR 1051281 | [2011/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364794 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B21D53/92, B21D47/00, B64C1/00, B64C3/24 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
B21D35/005 (US);
B21D47/00 (EP,US);
B21D53/92 (EP,US);
B23P15/00 (EP,US);
B64F5/10 (EP,US);
B23P2700/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer gekrümmten, vestärkten Struktur aus Metall sowie durch dieses Verfahren hergestellte Struktur | [2011/37] | English: | Method for manufacturing a reinforced and curved metal structure and structure obtained by the method | [2011/37] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'une structure métallique courbe renforcée et structure correspondante | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004101655 (BRYANS PHILIP R [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02055383 (REMMELE ENGINEERING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004211498 (KEIDEL CHRISTIAN JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004058013 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1127785 (EADS AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1682688 |