|
17.04.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2024 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
23.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.05.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.11.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.11.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
54 |