EP2371529 - IMPROVED COMPOSITE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/40] | Improved composite materials | ||
[2023/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexcel Composites Limited Duxford Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 4QB / GB | [2023/24] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Hexcel Composites Limited Duxford Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 4QD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simmons, Martin 14 Grosvenor Road West Baldock, Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
Cawse, John 4 Viking Close Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB21 5NH / GB | 03 /
Green, George 14 Vine Close Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 5BZ / GB | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/24] | Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/52] | Pols, Ronald Maarten Hexcel Composites Limited Ickleton Road Duxford Cambridge CB22 4QD / GB | ||
Former [2011/40] | Willett, Christopher David, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 11155080.2 | 06.11.2007 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | GB20060022060 | 06.11.2006 Original published format: GB 0622060 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2371529 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2371529 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2371529 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/22, B32B5/28, B32B5/30, C08J5/00, C08J5/04, C08J5/06, C08J5/10, C08J5/24, B82Y30/00 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B32B5/24 (CN);
H05F3/02 (US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B37/24 (CN);
B32B5/22 (EP,US);
B32B5/28 (CN);
B32B5/30 (CN);
B64D45/02 (CN);
C08J5/042 (EP,US);
C08J5/06 (EP,US);
C08J5/10 (EP,US);
C08J5/243 (EP,CN,US);
C08J5/249 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2260/023 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/106 (US);
B32B2264/02 (EP,US);
B32B2264/10 (EP,US);
B32B2264/105 (EP,US);
B32B2264/108 (EP,US);
B32B2305/076 (EP,US);
B32B2307/202 (EP,US);
B32B2307/206 (US);
B32B2307/212 (EP,US);
B32B2571/00 (US);
Y10S428/929 (EP,US);
Y10S428/931 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49194 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/268 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2016 (EP,US);
Y10T442/209 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2107 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2115 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2123 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2418 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/40] | B32B5/22, B32B5/28, B32B5/30, C08J5/00, C08J5/04, C08J5/06, C08J5/10, C08J5/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/40] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE | [2023/08] | English: | IMPROVED COMPOSITE MATERIALS | [2023/09] | French: | MATÉRIAUX COMPOSITES AMÉLIORÉS | [2023/08] |
Former [2011/40] | VERBESSERTE VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE | ||
Former [2011/40] | Improved composite materials | ||
Former [2011/40] | MATÉRIAUX COMPOSITES AMÉLIORÉS | Examination procedure | 18.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 01.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07824456.3 / EP2069138 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070824456) is 27.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | NL | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | LU | 06.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 14.06.2023 | |
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 14.06.2023 | |
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | LT | 14.06.2023 | |
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | NL | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 14.06.2023 | |
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4556591 (BANNINK JR ENGBERT T [US]) [A] 1,17-19 * column 2, line 39 - line 57; figures 2-5; claim - ** column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 66 *; | [A]GB2205275 (PLESSEY CO LTD) [A] 1,17,18 * originally filed;; claims 1,2,4,5 * * page 2, line 17 - line 22 *; | [A]US4973514 (GAMBLE JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 16 - line 61; claims 1,5,6,10,11; tables I-III *; | [A]US5068061 (KNOBEL THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1,17 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 5 * * column 1, line 47 - line 66; claims 15-22,1,6,7-14 * * column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 20; figure - *; | [A]US6043169 (JAFFEE ALAN MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1,18 * column 7, line 23 - line 28; examples 5,1; claims 1,6-8 *; | [A]EP1099541 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1,18,19 * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] , [0018] - [0020] - [0052]; example 6; claim -; table 1 * | Examination | US2005070185 |