EP2368801 - Method for turning loose grouped articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koch, Peter Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
Spindler, Herbert Böhmerwaldstsrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2013/37] | 01 /
Koch, Peter Degerndorfer Strasse 14 83098 Brannenburg / DE | ||
02 /
Spindler, Herbert Eschenweg 12 83083 Riedering / DE | |||
Former [2011/39] | 01 /
Koch, Peter Waltenbergweg 11 83370 Seeon / DE | ||
02 /
Spindler, Herbert Eschenweg 12 83083 Riedering / DE | Representative(s) | Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Benninger, Johannes Benninger & Eichler-Stahlberg Patentanwälte Dechbettener Strasse 10 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11155132.1 | 21.02.2011 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | DE20101016056 | 22.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010016056 | [2011/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2368801 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65B21/06, B65B21/24, B65B35/40, B65B35/58 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
B65B21/06 (EP);
B65B21/245 (EP);
B65B35/405 (EP);
B65B35/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Drehen lose gruppierter Artikel | [2011/39] | English: | Method for turning loose grouped articles | [2011/39] | French: | Procédé de rotation d'articles groupés en vrac | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 26.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1972578 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [X] 1,2,7,10,12,13 * paragraphs [0018] , [0024] , [0027] - [0031] - [0034] , [0039] , [0043] , [0054] - [0056]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US2004154902 (SCHOENECK RICHARD JEROME [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US4051366 (GORDON JASON MORSE) [Y] 1-5,7-13 * column 1, lines 10-43; figures 1-6 * * column 4, lines 24-37 *; | [Y]FR2703325 (REMY EQUIPEMENT [FR]) [Y] 1,3,4,6 * figures 1-2 *; | [X]WO2009129404 (MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,12,13 * page 8, lines 17-25; figures 1-2 * * page 10, lines 7-8 * | by applicant | US5215180 | WO2007144920 | DE202005003077U | EP0605423 |