EP2322028 - Driver assistance system for agricultural workmachine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2016/48] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgarten, Joachim, Dr. Buchenweg 26 48361, Beelen / DE | 02 /
Fitzner, Werner Paul-Schallück-Straße 4 48231, Warendorf / DE | 03 /
Neu, Sebastian Warendofer Straße 11 49196, Bar Laer / DE | [2013/08] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
Baumgarten, Joachim, Dr. Buchenweg 26 48361, Beelen / DE | ||
02 /
Fitzner, Werner Paul-Schallück-Straße 4 48231, Warendorf / DE | |||
03 /
Neu, Sebastian Warendofer Straße 11 49196, Bar Laer / DE | |||
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Dr. Baumgarten, Joachim Buchenwegn 26 48361, Beelen / DE | ||
02 /
Fitzner, Werner Paul-Schallück-Straße 4 48231, Warendorf / DE | |||
03 /
Neu, Sebastian Warendofer Straße 11 49196, Bar Laer / DE | Application number, filing date | 11155189.1 | 15.09.2009 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | DE20091009767 | 20.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009009767 | [2011/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322028 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2322028 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/127 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
A01D41/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | Fahrerassistenzsystem für landwirtschaftliche Arbeitsmaschine | [2011/20] | English: | Driver assistance system for agricultural workmachine | [2011/20] | French: | Système d'assistance du conducteur pour machine de travail agricole | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 02.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09170323.1 / EP2220926 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090170323) is 21.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2013
ADMISSIBLE Deere & Company/John Deere GmbH & Co. KG One John Deere Place/John-Deere-Str. 70 Moline, Il 61265/US/68163 Mannheim/DE / US Opponent's representative Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2013/51] | 13.01.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.05.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.04.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.11.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/08] | Appeal following opposition | 19.05.2016 | Appeal received No. T1288/16 | 28.07.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.11.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | HR | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | MK | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | NL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | SM | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | NO | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | ES | 31.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | IE | 15.09.2013 | LU | 15.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | AT | 15.09.2014 | [2016/12] |
Former [2015/34] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
LU | 15.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CZ | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CZ | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 20.02.2013 | |
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
NO | 20.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0928554 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,7,12,15,16 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0009] - [0011] - [0019] , [0021] , [0025] - [0027] - [0031] - [0034] - [0037] *; | [XDAY]DE10147733 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [XD] 1-4,14-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] , [0007] , [0009] - [0025] - [0033] - [0048] * [A] 12 [Y] 7-10; | [XAI]US2003216158 (BISCHOFF LUTZ [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0024] - [0026] - [0028] - [0032] - [0034] * [A] 8,10-12 [I] 6; | [XAYI]EP1504648 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-5,14-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0010] , [0011] , [0016] - [0019] - [0025] - [0030] * [A] 12 [Y] 7-10 [I] 6 | by applicant | DE10147733 |