EP2492786 - Operating element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAFI GmbH & Co. KG Ravensburger Strasse 128-134 88276 Berg / DE | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bulach, Eric / Schillerstrasse 13/1 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | 02 /
Seybold, Lothar / Neu-Aichach 1 88276 Berg / DE | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Engelhardt & Engelhardt Montafonstrasse 35 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2012/35] | Application number, filing date | 11155357.4 | 22.02.2011 | [2012/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492786 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/044, G06F3/041 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
G06F3/0444 (EP);
G06F3/044 (US);
G06F3/04142 (EP,US);
H03K17/962 (EP);
H03K17/97 (EP);
G06F2203/04106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bedienelement | [2012/35] | English: | Operating element | [2012/35] | French: | Elément de commande | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 10.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000346606 (TOTOKU ELECTRIC) [A] 4-6 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US2002149571 (ROBERTS JERRY B [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4,6-8 * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] *; | [A]US2004156168 (LEVASSEUR LEWIS H [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-4,6-14 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0059] *; | [A]US2008202824 (PHILIPP HARALD [IE], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-17 * * paragraph [0022] ** paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] *; | [XI]WO2010106759 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,8,9 * figures 1-21 * [I] 2-4,6,7,10; | US2011157087 [ ] (KANEHIRA HIROKI [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0098] * | by applicant | EP20100155169 |