EP2362266 - Colored curable composition, color filter and method of producing color filter, solid-state image sensor and liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [2017/14] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanna, Shinichi c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Oota, Kazuya c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Yoshikawa, Masaru c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Ito, Junichi c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 05 /
Fujie, Yoshihiko c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 06 /
Suzuki, Shigekazu c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11155568.6 | 23.02.2011 | [2011/35] | Priority number, date | JP20100043529 | 26.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010043529 | JP20100043530 | 26.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010043530 | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2362266 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2362266 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00, G03C1/735, H01L27/146, C07D207/335, G03F7/105 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
C07D207/335 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/223 (KR,US);
C07D207/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C09B23/0008 (EP,KR,US);
C09B23/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09B57/00 (EP,US);
C09B67/0033 (EP,KR,US);
C09B69/105 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/04 (US);
G02B5/201 (KR);
G02F1/1303 (KR);
G03C1/735 (EP,US);
G03F7/0007 (EP,US);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/105 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/35] | G03F7/00, G03C1/735, H01L27/146, C07D207/335 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gefärbte härtbare Zusammensetzung, Farbfilter und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Farbfilters, Festkörperbildsensor und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung | [2011/35] | English: | Colored curable composition, color filter and method of producing color filter, solid-state image sensor and liquid crystal display device | [2011/35] | French: | Composition durcissable colorée, filtre de couleur, procédé de fabrication du filtre de couleur, capteur d'images semi-conducteur et dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 31.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 23.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/02] | Divisional application(s) | EP12191064.0 / EP2568338 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000095805 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD, et al); | [XY]US2005131114 (SUNAHARA KENRO [JP], et al); | [YD]US2008076044 (MIZUKAWA YUKI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008138037 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009031713 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]TW201006895 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]); | [E]WO2011040628 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS4841708 | JPS4864183 | JPS4943191 | JPS506034 | JPS5137193 | JPS5230490 | JPS5425957 | JPS5434327 | JPS5812577 | JPS5944615 | JPS5953836 | JPS5971048 | US4774339 | US4808501 | JPS6490403 | JPS6491102 | JPH0194301 | US5059500 | JPH05333207 | JPH0611614 | JPH0635183 | JPH0651115 | JPH06194828 | JPH07128867 | JPH07146562 | US5433896 | JPH08278637 | JPH08295810 | JP2592207B | US5667920 | JPH10245501 | JPH1149974 | JPH11189732 | JPH11199796 | JP2000080068 | US6084250 | JP2000273370 | JP2001033616 | JP2001233842 | JP2001240761 | JP2001356210 | JP2002014220 | JP2002014221 | JP2002014222 | JP2002014223 | JP2002155052 | WO02100903 | JP2003240938 | JP2004295116 | JP3614586B | JP2005234478 | JP2006085140 | JP2006265528 | JP2006291191 | JP2006342166 | JP2007002101 | JP2007002102 | JP2007147784 | JP2007269779 | JP2007281523 | US2008171271 | JP2008292970 | JP2009288705 |