EP2335512 - Shopping bag made of nonwoven fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axis Co., Ltd. 3-3-13, Uchikanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miwa, Fukuichi c/o Axis Co., Ltd. 3-3-13 Uchikanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11156301.1 | 27.01.2009 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | JP20080016260 | 28.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008016260 | JP20080016261 | 28.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008016261 | JP20080065893 | 14.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008065893 | JP20080131849 | 20.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008131849 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2335512 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A45C3/04, B65D33/00, G09F3/10, B65D33/06, B65D33/02, // A45C3/00, A45C13/08, A45C13/26 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
A45C3/04 (EP,US);
B65D33/004 (EP,US);
B65D33/065 (EP,US);
B65D65/46 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
A45C13/08 (EP,US);
A45C13/26 (EP,US);
A45C3/001 (EP,US);
B65D2565/385 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | Einkaufstasche, die aus Vliesstoff hergestellt ist | [2011/25] | English: | Shopping bag made of nonwoven fabric | [2011/25] | French: | Sac de courses en étoffe non tissée | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09250203.8 / EP2082663 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090250203) is 15.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2469355 (TEMANA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 35 *; | [A]US4588392 (MADDOCK ROBERT T [US]) [A] 1* column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 18 *; | [A]EP0423729 (STIEGLER MASCHF GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 51 * | by applicant | JP3876409B | JP3959674B | JP2008016260 | JP2008016261 | JP2008065893 | JP2008131849 |