EP2380790 - Method to support a driver of a motor vehicle during the starting processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mair, Roland Am Husarenplatz 10 88069, Tettnang / DE | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/43] | Application number, filing date | 11156589.1 | 02.03.2011 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | DE20101028074 | 22.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010028074 | [2011/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2380790 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/43] | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/12, B60T13/66, B60T13/74, B60T17/18, B60W10/18, B60W30/18 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
B60T7/122 (EP,US);
B60T13/662 (EP,US);
B60T13/746 (EP,US);
B60W30/18027 (EP,US);
B60W30/18118 (EP,US);
B60W50/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Unterstützung des Fahrers eines Kraftfahrzeugs bei Anfahrvorgängen | [2011/43] | English: | Method to support a driver of a motor vehicle during the starting processes | [2011/43] | French: | Procédé destiné à assister le conducteur d'un véhicule automobile dans des processus de démarrage | [2011/43] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE10200783 |