EP2365551 - Light emitting device with thermo electric cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 416, Hangang-daero Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | [2014/24] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Kyung Wook Seoul Square, 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga, Jung-gu 100-714, Seoul / KR | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11156644.4 | 02.03.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | KR20100020649 | 09.03.2010 Original published format: KR 20100020649 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2365551 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2365551 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/64, H01L35/00 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
H01L33/645 (EP,US);
H10N10/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2011/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lichtemittierende Vorrichtung mit thermoelektrischer Kühlung | [2011/37] | English: | Light emitting device with thermo electric cooling | [2011/37] | French: | Dispositif électroluminescent avec un refroidisseur thermoélectrique | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 27.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5927568 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]KR100759015B (SEOUL SEMICONDUCTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]US2008006843 (DAI MING-JI [TW], et al); | [X]EP1993149 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC [JP]) |