EP2381310 - Fluid handling structure and lithographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/43] | Fluid handling structure, lithographic apparatus and device manufacturing method | ||
[2014/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands BV Corporate IP De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands BV Corporate IP De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cortie, Rogier Concordiahof 11 6014 CK, Ittervoort / NL | 02 /
Liebregts, Paulus Dorpstraat 45 5504 HB, Veldhoven / NL | 03 /
Riepen, Michel Rietbeek 9 5501 CA, Veldhoven / NL | 04 /
Evangelista, Fabrizio Engelsbergenstraat 21 5616 JB, Eindhoven / NL | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Maas, Abraham Johannes, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Maas, Abraham Johannes, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/43] | Maas, Abraham Johannes ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11156770.7 | 03.03.2011 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | US20100326972P | 22.04.2010 Original published format: US 326972 P | US20100362961P | 09.07.2010 Original published format: US 362961 P | [2013/09] |
Former [2011/43] | US20100362972P | 22.04.2010 | |
US20100362961P | 09.07.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2381310 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2381310 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
G03F7/70341 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0274 (KR);
G03F7/2041 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/43] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitshandhabungsstruktur und lithographischer Apparat | [2014/49] | English: | Fluid handling structure and lithographic apparatus | [2014/49] | French: | Structure de manipulation de fluide et appareil lithographique | [2014/49] |
Former [2011/43] | Flüssigkeitshandhabungsstruktur, lithographischer Apparat und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Vorrichtung | ||
Former [2011/43] | Fluid handling structure, lithographic apparatus and device manufacturing method | ||
Former [2011/43] | Structure de manipulation de fluide, appareil lithographique et procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif | Examination procedure | 15.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 12.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2011 | AL | 06.05.2015 | AT | 06.05.2015 | BE | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | ES | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | IT | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | MK | 06.05.2015 | NL | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | RS | 06.05.2015 | SE | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | SM | 06.05.2015 | TR | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.03.2011 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.03.2011 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.03.2011 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008212046 (RIEPEN MICHEL [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,12,13 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0077] - [0081] *; | [Y]US2006232756 (LOF JOERI [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 18 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0147] - [0153] *; | [A]US2007085990 (CHIBANA TAKAHITO [JP]) [A] 1,12,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0073] - [0089] * | Examination | WO2007046523 | US2009279062 | by applicant | US4509852 | WO9949504 | WO2005064405 | US2006119809 | EP1420300 | US2004136494 | US2004207824 | US2008212046 | US2007030464 | US2006038968 | US20090239555 | US20090213657 |