EP2347848 - Machining method and machine tool for same, in particular a chamfering machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Profilator GmbH & Co. KG Zum Alten Rangierbahnhof 18 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2019/14] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Profilator GmbH & Co. KG Buchenhofener Strasse 35 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strauch, Martin Oberheidter Straße 10 42349 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Prock, Erich Alfons-Maurer-Straße 3 88213 Ravensburg / DE | [2020/20] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
Strauch, Martin Oberheidter Straße 10 42349 Wuppertal / DE | ||
02 /
Prock, Erich Alfons-Maurer-Straße 3 88213 Ravensburg / DE | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2011/30] | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner Corneliusstraße 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 11156774.9 | 20.09.2004 | [2011/30] | Priority number, date | DE20031047149 | 10.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10347149 | DE20031054395 | 20.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10354395 | [2011/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2347848 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2347848 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23F19/10, B23Q1/44, B23Q1/48, B23Q5/40 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
B23Q5/40 (EP);
B23F19/107 (EP);
B23Q1/44 (EP);
B23Q1/4828 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2011/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spanendes Bearbeitungsverfahren und zugehörige Werkzeugmaschine, insbesondere Abdachmaschine | [2011/30] | English: | Machining method and machine tool for same, in particular a chamfering machine | [2011/30] | French: | Procédé de traitement par serrage et machine-outil associée, notamment machine à chanfreiner | [2011/30] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04766825.6 / EP1677937 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040766825) is 05.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2004 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | IT | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | AT | 20.09.2020 | GB | 20.09.2020 | IE | 20.09.2020 | LU | 20.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | FR | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
AT | 20.09.2020 | ||
GB | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | CZ | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
AT | 20.09.2020 | ||
GB | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | CZ | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
GB | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | CZ | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 13.05.2020 | |
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19800034 (ELB SCHLIFF WERKZEUGMASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XDI]DE10113653 (WERNER HERMANN WERA WERKE [DE]) [XD] 6,8,12 * the whole document * [I] 1-5,7,9-11,13,14 | by applicant | DE1048762 | EP0107826 | DE10113653 |