EP2398047 - Susceptor and Chemical Vapor Deposition Apparatus including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2013/02] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Samsung LED Co., Ltd. 314, Maetan 3-dong Yeoungtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 443-743 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Young-ki 202, 205-27 Maetan 4-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jung, Ho-il 204, 260-16 Woncheon-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Koh, Chong-mann 7-501 Samsung 1-chap apt. Maetan 4-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Han, Sung-il 403-1108 Byucksan Apt. Gwonseon-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11156820.0 | 03.03.2011 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | KR20100056691 | 15.06.2010 Original published format: KR 20100056691 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2398047 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2398047 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/687, C23C16/458, C23C16/455 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
H01L21/68764 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45521 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/4584 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/68771 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | H01L21/687 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Suszeptor und chemische Dampfabscheidungsvorrichtung damit | [2011/51] | English: | Susceptor and Chemical Vapor Deposition Apparatus including the same | [2011/51] | French: | Suscepteur et appareil de dépôt de vapeur chimique l'incluant | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5580388 (MOORE GARY M [US]) [Y] 4,5,11,12 * figure 15 * [A] 1,8; | [XY]US2007062455 (SAXLER ADAM W [US]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0088] , [0097] * [Y] 4,5,11,12; | [E]EP2476778 (SAMSUNG LED CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1,8* abstract *; | [E]US2012204796 (RUDA Y WITT FRANCISCO [DE], et al) [E] 1,8 * figure 2 * |