EP2322412 - Vehicle with a variable rear toe angle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanagi, Takashi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2012/07] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Yanagi, Takashi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11156955.4 | 13.01.2009 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | JP20080001691 | 08.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008001691 | JP20080002234 | 09.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008002234 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322412 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2322412 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D17/00, B62D7/14, B62D7/15 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
B62D7/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2011/20] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug mit variablem hinterem Spurwinkel | [2011/20] | English: | Vehicle with a variable rear toe angle | [2011/20] | French: | Véhicule avec angle de pincement arrière variable | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 26.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09000333.6 / EP2078663 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090000333) is 01.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0439207 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0512591 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0439207 | JPH0930438 | JP2008049851 | EP1892180 |