EP2378093 - Exhaust gas treatment device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eberspächer Exhaust Technology GmbH & Co. KG Homburger Strasse 95 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states J. Eberspächer GmbH & Co. KG Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarz, Roland Esslinger Str. 22 73732 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Grupp, Johannes Schweriner Str. 4 73072 Donzdorf / DE | 03 /
Wenz, Marco Hirschlandstr. 110 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/46] |
Former [2011/42] | BRP Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11157076.8 | 04.03.2011 | [2011/42] | Priority number, date | DE20101015271 | 15.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010015271 | [2011/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2378093 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2378093 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/14, F01N3/28 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
F01N3/2867 (EP,US);
F01N3/2875 (EP,US);
F01N13/14 (EP,US);
F01N2260/10 (EP,US);
F01N2350/04 (EP,US);
F01N2350/06 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/42] | F01N3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2011/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Abgasbehandlungseinrichtung | [2011/42] | English: | Exhaust gas treatment device | [2011/42] | French: | Dispositif de traitement des gaz d'échappement | [2011/42] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2011 | AL | 11.11.2015 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | ES | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | HR | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | MK | 11.11.2015 | MT | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | PL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | RS | 11.11.2015 | SE | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | SM | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | NO | 11.02.2016 | GR | 12.02.2016 | AT | 04.03.2016 | IE | 04.03.2016 | LU | 04.03.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 04.03.2011 | |
BG | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
AT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.03.2011 | |
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
AT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.03.2011 | |
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
AT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
AT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IE | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE2364425 (BOYSEN FRIEDRICH KG) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * page 5 - page 8 * * page 12 - page 14 * * figure 5 * [I] 6,8; | [A]DE19711789 (ZEUNA STAERKER KG [DE]) [A] 1,6,8 * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2877038 (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,5,6 * page 11, line 34 - page 13, line 19 * * figure 6 *; | [A]EP1715154 (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0029] ** figure 3 * |