EP2369191 - Bearing assembly with two spherical roller bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bernecker+Rainer Industrie-Elektronik Gesellschaft MbH B & R Strasse 1 5142 Eggelsberg / AT | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bohatsch, Elmar Hackenbuch 205 5141, Moosdorf Hackenbuch / AT | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Christian, et al Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Straße 70 1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Weiss, Christian, et al Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2012/44] | Weiss, Christian, et al Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Straße 70 1040 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2011/39] | Weiss, Christian, et al Pinter, Laminger & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 11157145.1 | 07.03.2011 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | AT20100000362 | 08.03.2010 Original published format: AT 3622010 | [2011/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2369191 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2369191 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2369191 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/54, F16C23/08, F16C25/08, F16C27/08, H02K5/16, H02K7/08, H02K5/173 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
F16C19/30 (EP);
F16C19/54 (EP);
F16C23/086 (EP);
F16C25/083 (EP);
F16C27/08 (EP);
H02K5/16 (EP);
H02K5/1732 (EP);
H02K7/08 (EP);
F16C2380/26 (EP);
H02K2205/03 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | F16C19/54, F16C23/08, F16C25/08, F16C27/08, H02K5/16, H02K7/08 | ||
Former IPC [2011/39] | F16C19/54, F16C23/08, F16C25/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/39] | Title | German: | Lageranordnung mit zwei Pendelrollenlagern | [2011/39] | English: | Bearing assembly with two spherical roller bearings | [2011/39] | French: | Agencement de stockage doté de deux roulements à rotule | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 08.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2011 | AL | 07.08.2013 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | DK | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | HR | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | LV | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | MK | 07.08.2013 | MT | 07.08.2013 | NL | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | RS | 07.08.2013 | SE | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | SM | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | NO | 07.11.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | IE | 07.03.2014 | LU | 07.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MK | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
RS | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
RS | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
RS | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
RS | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 07.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010022954 (ROLLS ROYCE AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 13, line 2 - page 13, line 24; figure 7 *; | [Y]US2986436 (HITOSHI SHIOTSU) [Y] 1-4,6,7 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 20; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE4411760 (ROSTOCK DIESELMOTOREN [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6,7 * column 2, line 2 - line 10 * * column 4, line 36 - line 44; figure 4 *; | [Y]EP0916862 (SKF AB [SE]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0009]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4227755 (LUNDBERG ANDERS) [Y] 1,2,6,7 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 31; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US6637969 |