EP2367127 - Bridge device for coupling a medical network with a non-medical network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Storz Endoskop Produktions GmbH Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2011/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüderle, Klaus c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 02 /
Dechow, Dietmar c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/38] | Application number, filing date | 11157307.7 | 08.03.2011 | [2011/38] | Priority number, date | DE20101010949 | 10.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010010949 | [2011/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2367127 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2367127 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, H04L29/06 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Brückenvorrichtung zur Kopplung eines medizinischen Netzwerks mit einem nicht-medizinischen Netzwerk | [2011/38] | English: | Bridge device for coupling a medical network with a non-medical network | [2011/38] | French: | Passerelle pour le couplage d'un réseau médical avec un réseau non-médical | [2011/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 28.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004153289 (CASEY SHAWN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,11,13 * abstract * * figures 1A,2A * * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0065] * * paragraphs [0082] , [0086] * [I] 5,8,10,12; | [I]US2009002150 (ZILBERSTEIN AMIR [IL], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0042] *; | [I]WO2008001344 (GITA TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A] - STROTHER E, "Denial of service protection the nozzle", COMPUTER SECURITY APPLICATIONS, 2000. ACSAC '00. 16TH ANNUAL CONFERENC E NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA 11-15 DEC. 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20001211), doi:10.1109/ACSAC.2000.898855, ISBN 978-0-7695-0859-7, pages 32 - 41, XP010529798 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 35, column 2, lines 1-2 * * page 37, column 1, lines 13-30 * * page 38, column 2, lines 7-9 * * page 39, column 1, lines 5-7 * * page 39, column 2, lines 7-11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSAC.2000.898855 |