EP2363022 - Use of oxygen antagonists for the therapeutic treatment of mammals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center 1100 Fairview Avenue North,C2M 027, P.O.Box 19024 Seattle, WA 98109-1024 / US | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roth, Mark, B. 508 North Bowdoin Place Seattle, WA 98103 / US | 02 /
Blackstone, Eric 1412 Summit Avenue No. 403 Seattle, WA 98122 / US | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11157706.0 | 22.10.2004 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | US20030513458P | 22.10.2003 Original published format: US 513458 P | US20040548150P | 26.02.2004 Original published format: US 548150 P | US20040577942P | 08.06.2004 Original published format: US 577942 P | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2363022 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2363022 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
C12N5/00 (EP,US);
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
A01N1/0221 (EP,US);
C12N2500/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/36] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Sauerstoff-Antagonisten für die therapeutische Behandlung von Saugetieren | [2011/36] | English: | Use of oxygen antagonists for the therapeutic treatment of mammals | [2011/36] | French: | Utilisation d'antagonistes d'oxygène pour le traitement thérapeutique de mammifères | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 20.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2015 | 16.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/17] | 03.02.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/17] | Appeal following examination | 07.09.2015 | Appeal received No. T0206/16 | 03.02.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04796043.0 / EP1684579 | Divisional application(s) | EP15165996.8 / EP2949212 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040796043) is 02.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2017 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9813058 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10-15 * abstract *; | [X]FR2816212 (AIR LIQUIDE SANTE INT [FR]) [X] 1,5,10-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO03072024 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US], et al) [A] 1,5,10-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 2 - line 4 * * page 4, line 13 - line 18 *; | [X]RU2177299 ; | [X]RU2177774 | [A] - SATO K ET AL, "Carbon monoxide generated by heme oxygenase-1 suppresses the rejection of mouse-to-rat cardiac transplants", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20010101), vol. 166, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4185 - 4194, XP002314148 [A] 1,5,10-15 * abstract * | [X] - BROUARD S ET AL, "Carbon monoxide generated by heme oxygenase 1 suppresses endothelial cell apoptosis", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (20001002), vol. 192, no. 7, doi:10.1084/JEM.192.7.1015, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 1015 - 1025, XP002367559 [X] 1,5,10-15 * abstract * * page 1022, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.192.7.1015 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 17, Database accession no. 2002-129020, XP002652216 & RU2177299 C2 20011227 (BLACK SEA HEALTH RESORT TREATMENT) [X] 1,5,10-15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 22, Database accession no. 2002-170428, XP002652217 & RU2177774 C2 20020110 (BLACK SEA HEALTH RESORT TREATMENT) [X] 1,5,10-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US6602277 | US5801005 | US5739169 | US5830880 | US5846945 | US6524785 | US6492103 | US6365338 | US6054261 | US5719174 | US5693462 | US5599659 | US5552267 | US5405742 | US5370989 | US5066578 | US4938961 | US4798824 | US5736397 | US6490880 | US6046046 | US5476763 | US5285657 | US3995444 | US3881990 | US3777507 | US5912019 | US5952168 | US5217860 | US4559258 | US6187529 | US5752929 | US5395314 | US5699793 | US6552083 | US4292817 | US4473637 | US4745759 | US5434045 | US4723974 | US6100082 | US5326706 | US5157930 | US4951482 | US4502295 | US4186565 | US5543158 | US5641515 | US5399363 | US5466468 | US4034753 | US4266573 | US4442856 | US5568910 | US5645081 | US5636643 | US4447415 | US4828976 | US5231025 | US5470738 | US5569579 | US5580781 | US6013256 | US6057148 | US6790603 | - LEDINGHAM ET AL., J. THORAC. CARDIOBASC. SURG., (1987), vol. 93, pages 240 - 246 | - LEDINGHAM ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1990), vol. 82, pages IV351 - 8 | - MENASCHE, J., EUR. J. CARDIO. THORAX. SURG., (1994), vol. 8, pages 207 - 213 | - BERNARD ET AL., J. THORAC. CARDIOVASC. SURG., (1985), vol. 90, pages 235 - 242 | - KURODA ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1988), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 457 - 460 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, pages 1035 - 1038,157 | - ALAM, ANTIOXID REDOX SIGNAL, (2002), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 559 - 62 | - AMERSI, HEPATOLOGY, (2002), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 815 - 823 | - AUSTIN-WARD; VILLASECA, REVISTA MEDICA DE CHILE, (1998), vol. 126, no. 7, pages 838 - 845 | - BEHRINGER ET AL., CRIT. CARE MED., (2003), vol. 31, no. 5, pages 1523 - 1531 | - BELLAMY ET AL., "24", CRIT. CARE MED., (1996), no. 2, pages 24 - 47 | - BOYCE; HAM, J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1983), vol. 81, pages 335 - 405 | - BOYCE; HAM, J. TISSUE CULTURE METHODS, (1985), vol. 9, pages 83 - 93 | - BRIESE, NEUROSCI. BIOBEHAV. REV., (1998), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 427 - 436 | - BRIZEL, SEMINARS RADIATION ONCOL., (1998), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 17 - 20 | - BROUARD ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, no. 20, pages 17950 - 17961 | - BUKOWSKI ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 4, no. 10, pages 2337 - 2347 | - CHRISTODOULIDES ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 144, pages 3027 - 3037 | - "90 day vapor inhalation toxicity study of hydrogen sulfide", Toxigenics, CHEMICAL INDUSTRY INSTITUTE OF TOXICOLOGY, (1983), pages 420 - 0710 | - CURRAN, SEMINARS RADIATION ONCOL., (1998), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 2 - 4 | - DAVIDSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOTHER., (1998), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 389 - 398 | - DILLMAN, CANCER BIOTHER. RADIOPHARM., (1999), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 5 - 10 | - DORMAN ET AL., NEUROTOXICOL. TERATOL., (2000), vol. 22, no. 1, pages 71 - 84 | - DULAK ET AL., ANTIOXID. REDOX SIGNAL, (2002), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 229 - 240 | - ETO ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2002), vol. 293, pages 1483 - 1488 | - GANTHER, CARCINOGENESIS, (1999), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1657 - 66 | - GILBERT ET AL., LANCET, (2000), vol. 355, pages 375 - 376 | - GORMAN ET AL., TOXICOLOGY, (2003), vol. 187, no. 1, pages 25 - 38 | - GUILLEMIN ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 89, no. 1, pages 9 - 12 | - HAASE ET AL., ANNALS OF SURGERY, (2004), vol. 240, no. 2, pages 364 - 373 | - HANIBUCHI ET AL., INTL. J. CANCER, (1998), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 480 - 45 | - HELLSTRAND ET AL., ACTA ONCOLOGICA, (1998), vol. 37, no. 4, pages 347 - 353 | - HIGUCHI; FUKAMACHI, FOLIA PHARMACOLOGICA JAPONICA, (1977), vol. 73, no. 3, pages 307 - 319 | - HOCHACHKA ET AL., COMP. BIOCHEM. PHYSIOL. B BIOCHEM. MOL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 130, no. 4, pages 435 - 459 | - HOCHACHKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, no. 18, pages 9493 - 94938 | - HUI; HASHIMOTO, INFECTION IMMUN., (1998), vol. 66, no. 11, pages 5329 - 5336 | - HYSPLER ET AL., J. CHROMATOGRAPHY, (2002), vol. 770, pages 255 - 259 | - JIANG ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. CELL PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 280, pages 1140 - 1150 | - JU ET AL., J. NEUROPATHOL. EXP. NEUROL., (2000), vol. 59, no. 3, pages 241 - 50 | - KHAN ET AL., TOXICOL. APPLIED PHARMACOL., (1990), vol. 103, pages 482 - 490 | - KILBURN; WARSHAW, TOXICOLOGY INDUST. HEALTH, (1995), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 185 - 197 | - KILBURN, ENVIRON. HEALTH, (1999), vol. 54, no. 3, page 150 | - KILBURN, ENVIRON. RES., (1999), vol. 81, no. 2, pages 92 - 99 | - KUBULUS ET AL., "The mechanism of the delay phenomenon: tissue protection is mediated by heme oxygenase-1", INSTITUTE FOR CLINICAL EXPERIMENTAL SURGERY, (2004), pages 1 - 21 | - LEDINGHAM ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1990), vol. 82, no. 2, pages V351 - 358 | - LUNDGREN-ERIKSSON ET AL., ANTICANCER RES., (200109), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 3269 - 74 | - MENASCHE ET AL., EUR. J. CARDIO. THORAX. SURG., (1994), vol. 8, pages 207 - 213 | - NYSTUL ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 302, no. 5647, pages 1038 - 1041 | - OTTERBEIN ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. LUNG CELL MOL. PHYSIOL., (2000), vol. 279, no. 6, pages L1029 - L1037 | - OTTERBEIN ET AL., TRENDS IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 24, no. 8, pages 449 - 455 | - PADILLA ET AL., MOLEC. BIOLOGY OFTHE CELL, (2002), vol. 13, pages 1473 - 1483 | - PADILLA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, no. 13, pages 7331 - 7335 | - PARTLO ET AL., NEUROTOXICOLOGY, (2001), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 177 - 189 | - PETERSEN, BIOCHEMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1977), vol. 460, pages 299 - 307 | - PIETRAS ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1998), vol. 17, no. 17, pages 2235 - 2249 | - QIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, no. 24, pages 14411 - 14416 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1980), pages 1035 - 1038,157 | - ROGER ET AL., GENOME, (1997), vol. 8, pages 711 - 713 | - RYTER; OTTERBEIN, BIOESSAYS, (2004), vol. 26, pages 270 - 280 | - SEMENZA, CELL, (1999), vol. 98, no. 3, pages 281 - 284 | - SEMENZA, TRENDS MOL. MED., (2001), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 345 - 350 | - STRUVE ET AL., NEUROTOXICOLOGY, (2001), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 375 - 385 | - TEODORO; OFARRELL, EMBO J., (2003), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 580 - 587 | - TISHERMAN, CRIT. CARE MED., (2004), vol. 32, no. 2, pages S46 - S50 | - VAN VOORHIES ET AL., J. EXP. BIOL., (2000), vol. 203, pages 2467 - 2478 | - WANG, FASEB J., (2002), vol. 16, no. 13, pages 1792 - 1798 | - ZHANG ET AL., J. APPL. PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 96, no. 1, pages 392 - 397 |