EP2369428 - Fixing device and image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Limited 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikushima, Yuuki Ricoh Company, Ltd. c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Sawahata, Sho Ricoh Company, Ltd. c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Kawamichi, Genichiro Ricoh Company, Ltd. c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Onodera, Ken Ricoh Company, Ltd. c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11157726.8 | 10.03.2011 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | JP20100058414 | 15.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010058414 | JP20100215704 | 27.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010215704 | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2369428 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2369428 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20, G03G15/00 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
G03G15/2039 (EP,US);
G03G15/2017 (EP,CN,US);
G03G15/5012 (EP,US);
G03G15/6588 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2011/39] | G03G15/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fixiervorrichtung und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2011/39] | English: | Fixing device and image forming apparatus | [2011/39] | French: | Dispositif de fixation et appareil de formation d'images | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 06.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 12.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1467260 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0046] - [0048] - [0 56]; figure 1 *; | [X]US6374063 (TODOME TSUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]JPS5766461 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [XD]JP2006215361 (RICOH PRINTING SYS LTD) [XD] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2010058414 | JP2010215704 | JPH10123864 | JP2006215361 |