Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
10.06.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.05.2013 | New entry: Observations by third parties | |
03.05.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.02.2013 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.12.2012 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.11.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
17.10.2012 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.06.2012 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.06.2012 | First examination report | |
29.03.2012 | New entry: Observations by third parties | |
23.03.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
24.02.2012 | Change - representative | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
15.02.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
14.01.2012 | New entry: Fee payment for extension state | |
01.07.2011 | Change - representative | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
17.06.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
17.06.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
15.03.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |