EP2501079 - Method for real-time data transmission in a communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steindl, Günter Katharinenstr. 22 92284, Poppenricht / DE | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/38] | Application number, filing date | 11158176.5 | 15.03.2011 | [2012/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2501079 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04L12/403 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
H04L12/40013 (EP,US);
H04L12/40026 (EP,US);
H04L12/4035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Echtzeit-Datenübertragung in einem Kommunikations-Netz | [2012/38] | English: | Method for real-time data transmission in a communication network | [2012/38] | French: | Procédé de transmission de données en temps réel dans un réseau de communication | [2012/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 23.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/26] | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE19721740 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-17 * figures 1,2,3,4 * * column 1, line 59 - line 67 * * column 3, line 5 - line 56 * * column 5, line 52 - line 54 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1675311 (BOSCH REXROTH AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * figure 4 ** paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0037] *; | [I]EP1748338 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-17 * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0002] * | by applicant | DE10058524 | DE10234149 |