EP2418767 - Amplifying device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tadano, Tsuneaki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2014/09] |
Former [2012/07] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11158359.7 | 15.03.2011 | [2012/07] | Priority number, date | JP20100147631 | 29.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010147631 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2418767 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2418767 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/02 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
H03F1/0288 (EP,US);
H03F1/0272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Title | German: | Verstärkervorrichtung | [2012/07] | English: | Amplifying device | [2012/07] | French: | Dispositif d'amplification | [2012/07] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 06.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2011 | AL | 26.02.2014 | AT | 26.02.2014 | BE | 26.02.2014 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | HR | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | MK | 26.02.2014 | MT | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | PL | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | RS | 26.02.2014 | SE | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | SM | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | IE | 15.03.2014 | LU | 15.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | NO | 26.05.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.03.2011 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MK | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
LU | 15.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.03.2011 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
LU | 15.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.03.2011 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03065599 (WAVICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 7, line 22 - page 9, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006001485 (PARKER KEVIN [CA], et al) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [A]GB2421130 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-6,8 * page 10, line 6 - page 11, line 3; figures 5,8 *; | [A]US2007075780 (KRVAVAC ENVER [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2093879 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022]; figures 2,3 *; | [A] - YONG-SUB LEE ET AL, "Highly linear and efficient asymmetrical Doherty power amplifiers with adaptively bias-controlled predistortion drivers", MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, 2009. MTT '09. IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090607), ISBN 978-1-4244-2803-8, pages 1393 - 1396, XP031490788 [A] 1-8 * page 1394; figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2000513535 | JP2007134977 | JP2008022513 | JP2008147857 |