EP2369482 - Display screen control device, display screen control method, and computer readable medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta Business Technologies, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7014 / JP | [2013/07] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Konica Minolta Business Technologies, Inc. 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Tatsunori c/o KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7014 / JP | [2013/04] |
Former [2011/39] | 01 /
Okada, Tatsunori c/o KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11158441.3 | 16.03.2011 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | JP20100065693 | 23.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010065693 | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2369482 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2369482 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/07, // H04N1/00, G06F3/12 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
G06F11/0793 (EP,US);
G06F11/0733 (EP,US);
H04N1/00037 (EP,US);
H04N1/00082 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/00464 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0039 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0081 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0082 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/39] | G06F11/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/39] | Title | German: | Anzeigebildschirm-Steuervorrichtung, Anzeigebildschirm-Steuerverfahren und computerlesbares Medium | [2011/39] | English: | Display screen control device, display screen control method, and computer readable medium | [2011/39] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle d'écran d'affichage, procédé de contrôle d'écran d'affichage et support lisible sur un ordinateur | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 18.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2011 | AL | 13.03.2013 | AT | 13.03.2013 | BE | 13.03.2013 | CY | 13.03.2013 | CZ | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | EE | 13.03.2013 | FI | 13.03.2013 | HR | 13.03.2013 | IT | 13.03.2013 | LT | 13.03.2013 | LV | 13.03.2013 | MK | 13.03.2013 | MT | 13.03.2013 | NL | 13.03.2013 | PL | 13.03.2013 | RO | 13.03.2013 | RS | 13.03.2013 | SE | 13.03.2013 | SI | 13.03.2013 | SK | 13.03.2013 | SM | 13.03.2013 | TR | 13.03.2013 | IE | 16.03.2013 | LU | 16.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 13.06.2013 | NO | 13.06.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | ES | 24.06.2013 | IS | 13.07.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AL | 13.03.2013 | |
AT | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MK | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
SM | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AL | 13.03.2013 | |
AT | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
SM | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AL | 13.03.2013 | |
AT | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
SM | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AL | 13.03.2013 | |
AT | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AL | 13.03.2013 | |
AT | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AL | 13.03.2013 | |
AT | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/43] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
RS | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
NO | 13.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006080571 (ICHINOWATARI YASUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0031] , [0032] , [0046] ** figure 3 *; | [A]EP1874025 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] , [0053] , [0054] , [0076] - [0082] - [0091] , [0123] , [0124] * * figure 9 *; | [A]US2010053674 (KANO TAKAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0069] - [0073] - [0084] , [0085] * * figures 2,4c * | by applicant | JP2010039663 | JP2010065693 |