EP2366823 - Sewing machine and non-transitory computer-readable medium storing sewing machine control program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [2011/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokura, Masashi c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha Intellectual Property Department 1-1-1 Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11158454.6 | 16.03.2011 | [2011/38] | Priority number, date | JP20100064429 | 19.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010064429 | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2366823 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Classification | IPC: | D05B19/10, D05B19/12, D05B35/12, D05C5/06 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
D05C5/06 (EP,US);
D05B19/10 (EP,US);
D05B19/12 (EP,US);
D05B35/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nähmaschine und übergangsloses computerlesbares Medium mit dem Nähmaschinensteuerprogramm | [2011/38] | English: | Sewing machine and non-transitory computer-readable medium storing sewing machine control program | [2011/38] | French: | Machine à coudre et support non transitoire lisible par un ordinateur stockant le programme de commande de la machine à coudre | [2011/38] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JPH05269285 | JP2008188148 | JP2009174981 | JP2009172123 | JP2009201704 |