EP2377450 - Dishwasher with a water inlet control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heidel, Andreas Am Hohlweg 21 89438, Holzheim-Weisingen / DE | 02 /
Hering, Reinhard St.-Stephanus-Str. 8 89438, Holzheim / DE | 03 /
Kränzle, Bernd Am Flecken 14 89561, Dischingen / DE | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/42] | Application number, filing date | 11158656.6 | 17.03.2011 | [2011/42] | Priority number, date | DE20101027754 | 14.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010027754 | [2011/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2377450 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2377450 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, A47L15/00 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
A47L15/4217 (EP);
A47L15/0023 (EP);
A47L15/4229 (EP);
A47L2401/14 (EP);
A47L2401/20 (EP);
A47L2501/01 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/42] | A47L15/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Geschirrspülmaschine mit einer Wasserzulaufeinrichtung | [2011/42] | English: | Dishwasher with a water inlet control device | [2011/42] | French: | Lave-vaisselle doté d'un dispositif d'amenée d'eau | [2011/42] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 05.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4409641 (AWECO KUNSTSTOFFTECH GERAETE [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * column 1, line 3 - column 1, line 55 * * column 2, line 53 - column 5, line 50 * * figures 1-2; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]EP1072968 (RANCO INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0012] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0056] * * figures 1-4; claims 1-19 *; | [Y]DE102007052085 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0019] *; | [A]DE4222240 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 3 - column 4, line 55 * * figures 1-2; claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE19840290 (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 59 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 33 * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE4022439 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,6,12 * column 1, line 3 - column 1, line 55 *; | [A]DE3839203 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 68 * * figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [A]DE3900705 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 8 * * figures 1-3; claims 15,16 * |