EP2375152 - Device and method for generating hot gas with integrated heating of a heat distribution medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann in Tirol / AT | [2015/27] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG Tiroler Strasse 16 3105 Unterradlberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Obwaller, Georg Neuwieben 70 6393, St. Ulrich am Pillersee / AT | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2017/03] |
Former [2011/41] | Cohausz & Florack Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11158981.8 | 21.03.2011 | [2011/41] | Priority number, date | DE20101014479 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010014479 | [2011/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2375152 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2375152 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2375152 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/46, F23J15/02 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
F23G5/46 (EP);
F23J15/027 (EP);
F23G2206/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2011/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Heißgaserzeugung mit integrierter Erhitzung eines Wärmeträgermediums | [2011/41] | English: | Device and method for generating hot gas with integrated heating of a heat distribution medium | [2011/41] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de production de gaz chaud avec chauffage intégré d'un fluide caloporteur | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/41] | Dispositif et procédé de production de gaz chaud avec chauffage intégré d'un fluide caloporteur | Examination procedure | 02.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 06.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | DK | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | FI | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | MT | 18.01.2017 | NL | 18.01.2017 | RS | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | SM | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | IE | 21.03.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | NO | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | CY | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
TR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | CY | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | DK | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | DK | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | DK | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | EE | 18.01.2017 | |
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | FI | 18.01.2017 | |
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3831535 (BAARDSON A) [X] 1,13,14,16,20 * column 3, line 64 - line end * * column 5, line 34 - line 55 * * column 6, line 10 - line 19 * * column 9, line 36 - column 11, line 14; figures 1, 3, 6, 6a * [Y] 2-5,10-12,15,17,18 [I] 6,20; | [YD]DE202007005195U (FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO [AT]) [YD] 2,4,10-12,15,18 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0008] , [0011] , [ 0012] , [ 0028] , [ 0037] , [ 0038]; figures 1, 2 *; | [YA]EP0832856 (ANDRITZ PATENTVERWALTUNG [AT]) [Y] 3,17 * column 4, line 18 - column 4, line 57; figures 2, 3 * [A] 20; | [Y]US4756890 (TANG JOHN T [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 66 - column 6, line 37; figures 2, 3 *; | [IA]US4457289 (KORENBERG JAKOB [US]) [I] 1,7-9,14,19 * column 1, line 6 - line 12 * * column 17, line 29 - column 20, line 5; figures 8-10 * [A] 2,6; | [A]DE2845630 (KONUS KESSEL WAERMETECH) [A] 1,2,20 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph 1 - page 13, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE3608248 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C) [A] 1,13,14 * column 3, line 57 - line 60 * * column 7, line 1 - line 42; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0551643 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020] *; | [A]DE4100859 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 6-9 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 8 * * column 4, line 7 - line 39 * | by applicant | DE202007005195U |