EP2374649 - Agricultural driving mechanism and related tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BCS S.p.A. Via Marradi, 1 20123 Milano (MI) / IT | [2013/21] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states BCS S.p.A. Via Marradi, 1 20123 Milano (MI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omodeo Vanone, Fabrizio Via Martiri delle Foibe, 7 27036, MORTARA (PV) / IT | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Branca, Emanuela, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2012/24] |
Former [2011/41] | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11159840.5 | 25.03.2011 | [2011/41] | Priority number, date | CN201010156328 | 30.03.2010 Original published format: CN201010156328 | [2011/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2374649 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2374649 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/28, A01B71/06, F16D1/10, F16D11/14 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
B60K17/28 (EP);
F16D1/101 (EP);
B60Y2200/221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/41] | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftlicher Antriebsmechanismus und zugehöriges Werkzeug | [2011/41] | English: | Agricultural driving mechanism and related tool | [2011/41] | French: | Mécanisme de commande agricole et outil correspondant | [2011/41] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 26.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2011 | AL | 22.05.2013 | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | HR | 22.05.2013 | IS | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | MK | 22.05.2013 | MT | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | PL | 22.05.2013 | RS | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | SM | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | NO | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IS | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MK | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IS | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IS | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN201388390Y (YINAN MA) [X] 1,3-6,8,10 * figure - *; | [X]FR1560109 (JEAN WALTERSCHEID K.G.) [X] 1,3-6,8-10 * figure - *; | [X]WO2008037006 (TAPP MARGARET JOAN [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 7, lines 1-7; figure 6 *; | [X]DE3140917 (WAGGERSHAUSER ARMIN) [X] 1,6 * figure - *; | [X]US4892430 (LISKA MIROSLAV [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * figure - *; | [X]FR2263675 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1,6 * figure - *; | [X]DE1482841 (MASSEY FERGUSON LTD) [X] 1,6 * figure 6 * |