EP2333799 - A switch comprising a blade-type moving contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, MT, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Daisuke c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Sadakuni, Hitoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2014/47] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
Fujita, Daisuke c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
Sadakuni, Hitoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11159969.2 | 06.11.2007 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2333799 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2333799 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01H31/28, H01H31/02, H02B13/02, H01H31/00, H01H1/42 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
H01H1/42 (EP,US);
H01H31/003 (EP,US);
H01H31/023 (EP,US);
H01H31/28 (EP,US);
H01H33/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/24] | Title | German: | Schalter mit einem blatttartigen beweglichen Kontakt | [2011/24] | English: | A switch comprising a blade-type moving contact | [2011/24] | French: | Commutateur comportant un contact mobile du type à lame | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 06.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07831292.3 / EP2214190 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070831292) is 17.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2007 | AT | 08.04.2015 | BE | 08.04.2015 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | CZ | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | ES | 08.04.2015 | FI | 08.04.2015 | IT | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MT | 08.04.2015 | NL | 08.04.2015 | PL | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | SE | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | TR | 08.04.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | GB | 06.11.2015 | IE | 06.11.2015 | LU | 06.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/47] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
GB | 06.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.11.2015 | ||
LU | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
IE | 06.11.2015 | ||
LU | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 08.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH10321084 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-10 * [A] 2-4; | [A]JPS53159563U (NOHMI BOSAI LTD:) [A] 1-4 * figures 2,4 *; | [A]JP2002110007 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | Examination | JP2002110007 | - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 52, Database accession no. 2002-483473, & JP2002110007 A 20020412 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JPS53159563U | JPH10321084 |