|
20.04.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2023 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2023 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
61 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
61 |
|
06.10.2022 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2022 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.04.2022 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2022 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2021 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.09.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.08.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
05.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.11.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |