14.04.2023 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
11.04.2023 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
06.02.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
03.02.2023 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
25.10.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
25.10.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
17.11.2021 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.03.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
19.04.2018 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
18.10.2017 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
14.07.2017 |
Opposition filed |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
09.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
11.11.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
09.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.11.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.08.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.04.2016 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.08.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.08.2014 |
First examination report |
|
26.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
02.10.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |