Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3067448 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2019 | B1 | EP3067448 | 14.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16165424 | 28.03.2011 | EP11160055 | 28.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101988892B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2019 | B1 | KR20120110016 | 09.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11160055 | 28.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6316894B | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B2 | JP2017036536 | 16.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11160055 | 28.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6014294B | Global Dossier | 25.10.2016 | B2 | JP2012207355 | 25.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11160055 | 28.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102704136B | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | B | CN102704136 | 03.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11160055 | 28.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2505702 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2023 | B2 | EP2505702 | 14.12.2016 | B1 | EP2505702 | 03.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11160055 | 28.03.2011 | Type | Divisional application | EP3067448 |