EP2386447 - Motor vehicle headlamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/46] | Motor vehicle headlamp | ||
[2014/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Automotive Lighting Reutlingen GmbH Tübinger Strasse 123 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [2011/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brendle, Matthias Schwabstraße 19 72074 Tübingen / DE | [2011/46] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/46] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11160102.7 | 29.03.2011 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | DE20101021002 | 14.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010021002 | [2011/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2386447 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2386447 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/076 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
B60Q1/076 (EP);
B60Q2200/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/46] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfer | [2014/44] | English: | Motor vehicle headlamp | [2014/44] | French: | Phare de véhicule automobile | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/46] | Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfer | ||
Former [2011/46] | Motor vehicle headlamp | ||
Former [2011/46] | Phare de véhicule automobile | Examination procedure | 14.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2011 | AL | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | HR | 29.10.2014 | IT | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | MK | 29.10.2014 | MT | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | RS | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | SM | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | NO | 29.01.2015 | GR | 30.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | PT | 02.03.2015 | GB | 29.03.2015 | IE | 29.03.2015 | LU | 29.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 29.03.2011 | |
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MK | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 29.03.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 29.03.2011 | |
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 29.03.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 29.03.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 29.03.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 29.03.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1854665 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8-11 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0026] , [0027] *; | [Y]DE202008007470U (SONCEBOZ SA [CH]) [Y] 1,2,8-11 * figure 2; claims 1,5 * * paragraph [0026] *; | [A]EP2088364 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0020] , [0030] * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO02069452 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * figures 1-3; claims 15,18,20,21 *; | [A]DE202007011199U (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-6; claims 1,4,5,11 * * paragraphs [0030] , [0034] *; | [A]EP1719662 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102007013074 (LUCAS AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 3-7 * abstract *; | [A]US5151849 (NAGENGAST WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 3-7 * figures 2-4 * | by applicant | DE102005041195 |