EP2505913 - An active thermal management device and thermal management method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Surdeanu, Radu c/o NXP Semiconductors IP & L Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | 02 /
Lenoble, Damien c/o NXP Semiconductors IP & L Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | ||
Former [2012/40] | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street, Redhill Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11160459.1 | 30.03.2011 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2505913 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2505913 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00, F21V29/50, F21Y115/10 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
F21S2/005 (US);
F21V29/00 (EP,US);
F21V29/54 (EP,US);
H01L23/427 (EP,US);
H01L23/4275 (EP,US);
F21V29/50 (EP,US);
F21V29/51 (EP,US);
F21V29/71 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
F28D20/02 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0029 (EP,US);
F28F2013/008 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/28] | F21Y101/02 | ||
Former IPC [2012/40] | F21V29/00, F21V29/02, F25D19/00, F25D23/02, F28D15/06, F28D20/02, F28F13/00, H01L23/427 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2012/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Aktive Wärmeverwaltungsvorrichtung und Wärmeverwaltungsverfahren | [2012/40] | English: | An active thermal management device and thermal management method | [2012/40] | French: | Dispositif de gestion thermique active et procédé de gestion thermique | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 16.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2011 | AL | 23.03.2016 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | RS | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | IE | 30.03.2016 | LU | 30.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | FR | 23.05.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | GB | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.03.2011 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LU | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.03.2011 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LU | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.03.2011 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6668819 (REMSBURG RALPH [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * column 2, line 32 - line 35 * * column 9, line 58 - column 10, line 29 * [Y] 3,10 [I] 7; | [X]WO03019093 (HUNTER RICK C [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * figure 3 * * page 10, line 1 - line 18 *; | [Y]US5867990 (GHOSHAL UTTAM SHYAMALINDU [US]) [Y] 3,10 * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 4 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2005099776 (XUE LIANG A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US6631755 (KUNG SHAO-TSU [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 3 - line 56 *; | [A]US2003221812 (HSIAO FENG-NENG [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5605048 (KOZLOV JURY F [SU], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006056809 (UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US3650117 (ROBINSON MAX C, et al) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * | Examination | US2011051449 | by applicant | US7104080 |