EP2348310 - Electrode preconditioning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2011/30] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sanhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roblin, Patricia Mary Elizabeth Roche Diagnostics GmbH of Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Hyland, Mark Roche Diagnostics GmbH of Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Newman, Christopher Paul Roche Diagnostics GmbH of Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | Simons, Amanda Louise J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11160489.8 | 28.06.2006 | [2011/30] | Priority number, date | US20050695157P | 29.06.2005 Original published format: US 695157 P | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2348310 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2348310 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/453, G01N27/49, G01N27/413, C12Q1/00 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
G01N27/327 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | Elektrodenvorkonditionierung | [2011/30] | English: | Electrode preconditioning | [2011/30] | French: | Préconditionnement d'electrode | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/30] | Préconditionnement d'électrode | Examination procedure | 14.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06755656.3 / EP1896840 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002026110 (PARRIS NORMAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0260] - paragraph [0262] *; | [AD]WO03056319 (OXFORD BIOSENSORS LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-15 * claim 23 * | [X] - NETCHIPOROUK L I ET AL, "Properties of carbon fibre microelectrodes as a basis for enzyme biosensors", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1995), vol. 303, no. 2-3, ISSN 0003-2670, pages 275 - 283, XP002360927 [X] 1-7,9-15 * Paragraphs 2.2 to 2.4; page 277 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2670(94)00538-W | by applicant | WO03056319 | WO2006000828 | GB20040014546 | GB20060011800 |